Cook, et al v. Rockwell Intl Corp

 
Case Number: 1:1990cv00181
Filed: January 30, 1990
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Economic Stabilization Act
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 2323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 7/18/2012 by Judge John L. Kane on 6/27/12. (dkals, )
August 15, 2012 2327 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Status Conference set for 8/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 802 before Judge John L. Kane, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/15/12. (sgrim)
October 3, 2012 2332 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM to Counsel Re Briefing Schedule on Remand re: 2330 Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule. The parties shall respond jointly to this Memorandum on or before October 15, 2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/3/12. (sgrim)
October 16, 2012 2334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Briefing Schedule on Remand. Plaintiffs' opening brief shall be due on or before December 12, 2012. Defendants' answer brief shall be due 60 days from the filing of Plaintiffs' opening brief. Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be due 45 days from filing of Defendants' response brief, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/16/12. (sgrim, )
January 28, 2014 2351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING at ECF. DOCS. 2344 , 2345 , & 2350 . Plaintiffs may not litigate this case outside the PAA. Parties shall prepare a Joint Status Report discussing the most effective way to proceed that is consistent with this Order and the Tenth Circuit's mandate. The Joint Status Report is due on or before February 25, 2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/28/14. (mfiel, )
February 27, 2014 2356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice and Entry of Final Judgment 2355 . This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each side to bear its own costs, and final judgment in favor of Defendants is entered by Judge John L. Kane on 02/27/14.(jhawk, )
February 27, 2014 2357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Clarification 2352 by Judge John L. Kane on 02/27/14.(jhawk, )
February 27, 2014 2358 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Dow Chemical Company, Rockwell International Corporation against Bank Western, Delores Schierkolk, Gertrude Babb, Lorren Babb, Merilyn Cook, Michael Dean Rice, Peggy J. Sandoval, Rhonda J. Deimer, Richard Bartlett, Sally Bartlett, Stephen Sandoval, Thomas L. Deimer, William Schierkolk, Jr re: 2356 Order on Motion for Order. Action dismissed with prejudice. Each side to bear own costs. Entered by Clerk on February 27, 2014. (ebutl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cook, et al v. Rockwell Intl Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]