Hoffman et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Hoffman, Gary Hoffman and Erica Hoffman
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00081
Filed: January 12, 2007
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 186 Plaintiffs Motion to Suspend all Pretrial Deadlines Pending Ruling on Plaintiffs Motions for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 01/15/2009.(sah, )
February 6, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2009. That the plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions 145 filed 10/31/2008, is taken under advisement. That the plaintiffs Motion for Sanction Against Defendant Ford Motor Company 173 filed 12/18/2008 is taken under advisement.(Court Reporter FTR-Ginny Kramer.) (sah, )
February 24, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The court has construed this pleading as a motion to withdraw the motion in limine, and the motion 211 is GRANTED. Defendants Joint Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony of J. Kendall Few 181 , filed 12/31/2008, is WITHDRAWN by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/24/2009.(sah, )
March 10, 2009 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Joint Motion For Juror Questionnaire 200 filed 02/06/2009 is granted in part by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/10/2009. The attached juror questionnaire and concomitant cover sheet are approved for use in the trial of this case. On or before Thursday, 04/02/2009, counsel for the parties shall provide Joann Garcia, Jury Commissioner for the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, fifty (50) copies of the attached juror questionnaire and concomitant cover sheet by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet to Juror Questionnaire, # 2 Juror Questionnaire)(sah, )
March 16, 2009 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 158 Defendants Joint Motion and Memorandum To Limit the Testimony and Opinions of Mariusz Ziejewski Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 702; and denying 159 Defendants Joint Daubert Motion To Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Craig Good by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/16/2009.(sah, )
March 16, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 204 Defendants Joint Motion To Bifurcate Trial by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/16/2009.(sah, )
March 12, 2009 244 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2009 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. ORDERED: (1) Doc 145 Motion for Sanctions against TRW is DENIED; (2) Defendant TRW shall supplement its discovery responses within 7 calendar days; (3) Doc 173 Motion for Sanctions against Ford Motor Company is DENIED; (4) On or before 3/20/2009 Defendant Ford shall produce documents as stated on the record; (5) Court will not award fees and costs to any prevailing party. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
March 23, 2009 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 202 Defendant For Motor Companys Motion in Limine To Exclude Evidence of Other Claims and Lawsuits by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/23/2009.(sah, )
April 1, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 257 Plaintiffs Motion For Security Exemptions Throughout Trial. On presentation of a copy of this order to the court security officers, plaintiffs counsel and their paralegal shall be permitted to enter the courthouse with their computers and cellular phones as provided in this order by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/01/2009.(sah, )
April 2, 2009 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 260 Defendants Motion For Security Exemptions Throughout Trial. On presentation of a copy of this order to the court security officers, plaintiffs counsel and their paralegal shall be permitted to enter the courthouse with their computers and cellular phones as provided in this order by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/02/2009.(sah, )
April 2, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER APPROVING REVISED JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE. On or before the close of business on Friday, 04/03/2009, counsel for the parties shall provide Joann Garcia, Jury Commissioner for the United States District Court for the District of Colora do, fifty (50) copies of the attached revised juror questionnaire and concomitant cover sheet. This order supplants and supersedes the Order Granting Joint Motion For Juror Questionnaire 232 entered 03/10/2009 by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/02/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet to Jury Questionnaire, # 2 Revised Jury Questionnaire)(sah, )
April 6, 2009 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Objections to Deposition Designations. That Plaintiffs Amended Objections to Defendants Ford Motor Company and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.s Designation of Deposition Testimony To Be Used at Trial and Counter Designations 222 are SUST AINED as set forth in this Order. Defendant Ford Motor Companys Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs Designation of Deposition Testimony of Richard Groh and William Ballard and Objections to the Deposition Testimony of Anne Erickson [23 9]are SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART as set forth in this Order. Defendant Ford Motor Companys Response to Plaintiffs Amended Deposition Designations 264 are SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART as set forth in this Order by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/06/09. (jjh, )
April 28, 2009 290 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Governing The Custody and Disposition of Trial Exhibits, Transcripts, and Papers by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/28/2009. (sah, )
May 14, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (TRW Vehicle SafetySystems, Inc. Only) 92 filed 05/14/2009, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/14/2009. (sah, )
October 20, 2009 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 296 Ford Motor Companys Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/20/2009.(sah, )
November 24, 2009 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To Alter or Amend the Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 52(b) and 59(e) To Increase Erica Hoffmans Award for Non-Economic Loss Under C.R.S. § 13-21-102.5(3)(a) and To Amend the Judgment To Include Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest 311 filed 10/30/2009, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/24/2009.(sah, )
November 24, 2009 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Submission of Proposed Judgment. Plaintiffs SHALL FILE their proposed form of judgment and a concomitant brief in support thereof by 12/04/2009. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/24/2009. (sah, )
March 4, 2010 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR JUDGMENT. Judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of plaintiffs, Erica Hoffman, Gary Hoffman, and Sandra Hoffman, and against defendant, Ford Motor Company, on the jurys verdict as to plaintiffs claims for strict liability and negligence. Plaintiff Erica Hoffman is AWARDED damages. Plaintiffs Gary Hoffman and Sandra Hoffman are AWARDED damages. Plaintiffs are AWARDED interest. Plaintiffs are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/04/2010. (sah, )
April 12, 2010 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 355 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment pending appeal and tender of supersedeas bond by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/12/10. The supersedeas bond is approved in the amount of $6,500,000.00 posted by Ford Motor Co.(bjrsl, )
May 13, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Ford Motor Companys Motion To Stay of Execution and Approving Defendant Ford Motor Companys Supersedeas Bond 361 , filed 04/12/2010 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/13/2010.(sah, )
November 8, 2012 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REMAND. Pursuant to 368 USCA Mandate, 348 Clerk's Judgment is VACATED; 351 Bill of Costs is VACATED; judgment SHALL BE ENTERED for the defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation, against the plaintiffs Erica Hoffman, Gary Hoffman, and Sandra Hoffman; the defendant is AWARDED its costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/8/12. (kfinn, )
November 15, 2012 370 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Ford Motor Company against Erica Hoffman, Gary Hoffman, Sandra Hoffman re: 369 Order on Remand. By Clerk on 11/15/12. (kfinn, )
January 17, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/17/07. (erv, )
February 4, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER, Set Hearings: Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/6/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn., Twenty Day Jury Trial set for 4/6/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/4/08. (erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoffman et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hoffman
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hoffman
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Hoffman
Represented By: W. Randolph Barnhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Chad David Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]