Shaw v. Play Dirty Colorado ATV Tours, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Shaw
Defendant: Play Dirty Colorado ATV Tours, L.L.C. and Polaris Industries, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv01513
Filed: July 17, 2007
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2009 105 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/01/09. (jjh, )
July 26, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER, Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/26/07. (erv, )
February 7, 2008 51 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/7/08. (erv, )
February 10, 2009 92 Featured Case ORDERED that Polaris Industries, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment 74 is granted as to the express warranty claim and denied as to the defective design and failure to warn claims by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/10/09.(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shaw v. Play Dirty Colorado ATV Tours, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Shaw
Represented By: April Marie Armani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Play Dirty Colorado ATV Tours, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]