Kilman v. Crossmark/CHI Management Group, LP

Plaintiff: John Kilman
Defendant: Crossmark/CHI Management Group, LP
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv01620
Filed: July 31, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2009 38 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/5/09. (msksec, )
February 9, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER: Ex Parte 17 Motion to Correct Docket Dates is voluntarily Withdrawn; denying 22 Motion for Opt. In Litigant by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 02/09/09.(wjc, )
May 29, 2009 52 Featured Case ORDER denying Mr. Kilman's 50 Motion for Leave to A[m]mend for failure to submit the proposed Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/29/09.(wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kilman v. Crossmark/CHI Management Group, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kilman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossmark/CHI Management Group, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]