Ehler et al v. Ipex, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eugene A. Ehler and Eugene (I) A. Ehler
Defendant: Ipex, Inc. and Ipex USA, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv02220
Filed: October 14, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2009 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Discovery due by 1/11/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/14/09.(erv, )
April 29, 2009 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/29/09.(erv, )
May 15, 2009 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 The parties Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time in Furtherance of Settlement Negotiations; withdrawing 17 Defendants Motion to Change Venue; granting 22 Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel ; Denying as moot 29 The parties Joint Motion for Order. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/15/09.(erv, )
May 20, 2009 48 Featured Case ORDER re: 45 Notice of Dismissal of Party, filed by Francis Cordes, Eugene (I) A. Ehler, Shivanii Singh, Eugene A. Ehler, Plaintiff Eugene A. Ehler is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action, each party to bear his or its own attorneys fees and costs. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue 17 is deemed withdrawn as of the date of this Order. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/20/09. (erv, )
July 29, 2009 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Order to Appoint Plaintiff's Steering Committee.This Case Management Order affects the organizational and leadershipstructure for Plaintiffs counsel in the instant action. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/09.(erv, )
August 14, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation on Defendants motion to transfer this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/14/09.(erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ehler et al v. Ipex, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene A. Ehler
Represented By: Michael D. Plachy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene (I) A. Ehler
Represented By: Michael D. Plachy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipex, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipex USA, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]