Elvig v. Nintendo of America, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Molly Elvig
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv02616
Filed: December 2, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: Arapahoe
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 100 Featured Case Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/18/2010, denying without prejudice 89 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition by Written Questions; denying without pre judice 95 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff for Exceptional Cause; denying without prejudice Defendant's request for attorneys' fees and costs associated with the response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition by Written Questions 89 . Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/14/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
May 20, 2010 121 Featured Case Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2010, granting in part and denying in part 114 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
September 23, 2010 128 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Nintendo's 111 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Nintendo on all of Ms. Elvig's claims. Nintendo's prior 91 summary judgment motion is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/23/2010.(wjc, )
December 2, 2008 1
Original Class Action COMPLAINT against Nintendo of America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number COX014810) Summons issued, filed by Molly Elvig. (Attachments: # 1 Exh 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Receipt)(llk, )
March 2, 2009 35 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/2/09. (msksec, )
March 12, 2009 37 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Add Party Plaintiffs, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/12/09.(wjc, )
June 15, 2009 47 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. The Stipulated Protective Order is accepted and entered contemporaneously with this minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/15/09.(wjc, )
June 15, 2009 48 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/15/09. (wjc, )
July 20, 2009 56 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 52 Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel Disclosure, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/20/2009. (mehcd)
July 31, 2009 58 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order as set forth in Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/31/09.(wjc, )
August 28, 2009 68 Featured Case ORDER denying 53 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Disclosure, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2009. (mehcd)
September 22, 2009 80 Featured Case ORDER denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Improperly Withheld; and denying request for attorney's fees. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/22/2009. (mehcd)
September 28, 2009 81 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/28/09.(msksec, )
September 30, 2009 82 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendant's 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. is DENIED AS MOOT. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/09. (msksec, )
October 30, 2009 85 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Defendant's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Rebuttal expert witness disclosure due by 12/30/2009. Discovery due by 1/29/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2010. No additional extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of exceptional cause. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/30/2009. (mehcd)
March 8, 2010 92 Featured Case Opinion and ORDER granting 41 Nintendo's Motion to Dismiss. Claims in the amended complaint are dismissed. Denying as moot 60 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. Effect of this ruling is stayed for 30 days during which time plaintif fs are granted leave to file Second Amended Complaint. If no amended pleading is filed within that time, dismissal of all claims shall become effective without further order and the Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/8/10.(gms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Elvig v. Nintendo of America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Elvig
Represented By: Robert B. Kleinman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]