State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Gateway, Inc.

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Gateway, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00270
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant Gateway, Inc.s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Nonparties at Fault by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/29/09.(erv, )
June 26, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended complaint tendered 6/25/09 is accepted for filing, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/26/09.(gms, )
October 22, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice 26 is GRANTED. The Complaint and civil action is dismissed with prejudice, each party topay its own costs and attorneys' fees. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/22/2009. (sah, )
March 5, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/5/09. (erv, )
March 10, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 5/12/2009 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/10/09. (erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Gateway, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David Duane Piper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Lopach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]