Van Vleet et al v. Fischer

In Re: Ricky Donovan Van Vleet
Plaintiff: Tom H. Connolly
Defendant: Erik G. Fischer
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv01892
Filed: August 10, 2009
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, it is ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 12 , filed August 27, 2010, is APPROVED, and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/30/2010. (erv, )
August 10, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REFER MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF THE REFERENCE TO THE DISTRICT COURT. The Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court shall transmit all relevant documents to the US District Court for further action, by Judge Sidney B. Brooks on 8/10/09. (jak, )
September 29, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Ordered that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Transfer 1 , which is construed as a motion to withdraw the reference, is granted. Ordered that this matter is REMANDED to the Bankruptcy Court for that Court to consider and determine all pre-t rial issues. Ordered that once discovery and other pre-trial phases of the case (including approval of the final pre-trial order) are completed, I will schedule and conduct a jury trial on the merits by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/29/09.(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Van Vleet et al v. Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ricky Donovan Van Vleet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom H. Connolly
Represented By: Alice A. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik G. Fischer
Represented By: Erik G. Fischer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]