Huckfeldt v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al

Plaintiff: Claire L. Huckfeldt
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Castle, Meinhold & Stawiarski, LLC, Cristel (I) D. Shepard and Cristel D. Shepard
Case Number: 1:2010cv01072
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. CM&S and Ms. Shepherd's Motion for Summary Judgment (# 91 ) and BAC's Motion for Summary Judgment (# 102 ) are GRANTED. The Defendants are entitled to judgment on all claims against them in this action. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of the Defendants. BAC's Motion to Dismiss (# 55 ) is DENIED as moot, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/29/2011.(wjc, )
September 19, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT: Ms. Huckfeldt's Motion to Alter Judgment 117 is DENIED. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/19/12.(msksec, )
June 29, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 13 Motion Requesting the Court Ensure Correct Defendant is Documented in 2 Notice Appearance Documents. Order denying 14 Motion to Add Information and denying 15 Motion to Add Information by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/29/10.(jjh, )
August 3, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/03/2010. (sah, )
August 5, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/5/10. (mskcd)
August 10, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Service by U.S. Marshal, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/5/10. (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Marshals Service Forms)(gmssl, )
October 19, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Scheduling Conference was held on 10/19/2010. ORDERED: Plaintiff's oral motion to withdraw the Motion to Correct is ACCEPTED. The Motion to Corre ct or Clearly Distinguish Party Name, doc # 30 , is WITHDRAWN. Plaintiff's Motion to Accept Exhibits, doc # 32 is DENIED. Plaintiff may file an Unopposed Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m. on 10/22/2010. Any further scheduling is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending future events. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
May 7, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency and denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/7/10.(jak, )
October 25, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Unopposed Motion to Leave to File an Amended Complaint [sic]. Ms. Huckfeldt may file a complete Amended Complaint in a single document on or before 11/08/2010, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/25/2010.(wjc, )
November 8, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Ms. Huckfeldt's tendered "Amended Complaint" filed 11/7/2010, doc # 45 is STRICKEN. On or before 11/29/2010, Ms. Huckfeld may file a complete Amended Complaint in a single document on the Complaint form (attached) provided fo r filing a civil suit. The court advises Ms. Huckfeldt to consult with the Clerk's Office staff by telephone for instructions to select the proper event for electronically filing the Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Form)(cbscd)
February 14, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 214/11. (msksec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huckfeldt v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire L. Huckfeldt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle, Meinhold & Stawiarski, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristel (I) D. Shepard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristel D. Shepard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]