Good v. First Revenue Assurance, LLC

In_re: Donald A. Good
Plaintiff: Donald A. Good
Defendant: First Revenue Assurance, LLC
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2010cv01411
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Plaintiff Donald A. Good's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/14/10.(ebs, )
December 21, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT pursuant to the 11 Stipulated Motion for Relief from Judgment. The Judgment 8 entered on June 30, 2010, shall be vacated, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/21/10.(ebs, )
January 7, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. This matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/7/11.(ebs, )
June 29, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Judgment shall enter in plaintiffs favor and against defendant First Revenue Assurance, LLC in the amount of $500 in statutory damages, plus attorneys fees in the amount of $450 and costs in the amount of $54, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/29/10. (ebs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Good v. First Revenue Assurance, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Donald A. Good
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A. Good
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Revenue Assurance, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]