Fisher et al v. General Steel Domestic Sales, LLC et al

Plaintiff: David B. Fisher, Bison Constructors Inc. and Mark Yakowec
Defendant: General Steel Domestic Sales, LLC, Jeffrey Knight, Nathan Wright, Bruce Graham, Lee Bashore, Steven Paige, John Vivian, Jonah Goldman and Wayne Gaston
Case Number: 1:2010cv01509
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THE CASE by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/22/2010. (erv, )
July 14, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/10. (bnbcd, )
October 31, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards By Summary Proceeding 26 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Arbitration Rulings 49 are DENIED. ORDERED that pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 10(a)(4), this matter is REMANDED back t o the arbitrator to issue a mutual, final and definite award with respect to the issue of whether the contracts are valid and enforceable leaving nothing open for judicial determination. ORDERED that the Motion to Enforce Order Compelling Arbitration and for Injunction of State Court Proceedings and Request for Forthwith Determination 23 is DENIED AS MOOT by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/31/11.(jjh, )
March 11, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER striking 64 Plaintiff's Motion for District Court to Take Jurisdiction of Proceeding by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/11/13.(jjhsl, )
April 10, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Unopposed Motion to Hold Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) in Abeyance as to Bison Constructors, Inc. 70 is GRANTED. The Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (b) is DENI ED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the parties shall brief the impact of the stay as to Bison Constructors, Inc. on the pending motions (ECF Nos. 66 and 69). The briefs shall be filed not later than Tuesday, April 30, 2013 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 04/10/13.(jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. General Steel Domestic Sales, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Fisher
Represented By: Paul M. Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bison Constructors Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Yakowec
Represented By: Paul M. Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Steel Domestic Sales, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Knight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Bashore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Paige
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vivian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Gaston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]