Direct Marketing Association, The v. Huber Featured Case

Plaintiff The Direct Marketing Association challenged the constitutionality of a Colorado law that required out-of-state retailers to report certain information about its customers' purchases to the Colorado Department of Revenue.

Plaintiff: Direct Marketing Association, The
Defendant: Roxy Huber
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv01546
Filed: June 30, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 105 Featured Case ORDER Concerning Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Granting 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II Alleging Violations of the Commerce Clause. Denying 99 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Counts I and II (Commerce Clause). Roxy Huber is permanently enjoined and restrained as set forth in the order. Court will address in separate order parties' request to certify this order as a final judgment under Fed.R.Civ. P. 54(b), by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/30/12.(gmssl, )
September 21, 2011 104 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 63 Motion to Exclude by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/21/11. Motion to exclude [#63] was replaced and supplanted by the defendant's amended motion to exclude testimony [#71]. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebcd)
June 10, 2011 103 REPLY to Response to 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Counts I and II (Commerce Clause filed by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hubbell v. Carney Bros. Const.)(Snyder, Melanie) Modified on 6/13/2011 to remove repetitive text (sah, ).
June 10, 2011 102 REPLY to Response to 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Isaacson, George)
May 27, 2011 101 RESPONSE to 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II filed by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - HB10-1193 Reengrossed, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Williams Decl., # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - August 2010 Fiscal Note)(Snyder, Melanie)
May 27, 2011 100 BRIEF in Opposition to 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Counts I and II (Commerce Clause) filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Isaacson, George) Modified on 5/31/2011 to remove duplicate generated text (mnf, ).
May 6, 2011 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Counts I and II (Commerce Clause) by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Fox Decl. & Rep., # 2 Exhibit 2-1 IRS Tax Gap, # 3 Exhibit 2-2 IRS Tax Gap, # 4 Exhibit 2-3 IRS Tax Gap, # 5 Exhibit 2-4 IRS Tax Gap, # 6 Exhibit 2-5 IRS Tax Gap, # 7 Exhibit 2-6 IRS Tax Gap, # 8 Exhibit 2-7 IRS Tax Gap, # 9 Exhibit 2-8 IRS Tax Gap, # 10 Exhibit 3- Saliman Decl., # 11 Exhibit 4- Corjuo Decl., # 12 Exhibit 5- Gable Decl. & Rep., # 13 Exhibit 6- Barry Dep., # 14 Exhibit 7- Stevens Decl., # 15 Exhibit 8- Thompson Decl., # 16 Exhibit 9- Lichtenstein Decl. & Rep., # 17 Exhibit 10- Adler Dep.)(Snyder, Melanie)
May 6, 2011 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and II by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Isaacson, George)
May 4, 2011 97 MINUTE ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limitation for the parties' cross motions for summary judgment and their responses thereto are extended and said motions and responses may be up to 30 pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/4/11.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
May 3, 2011 96 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Cross Motions For Summary Judgment and Responses To Cross Motions by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Scoville, Stephanie)
April 28, 2011 95 ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint Counts I and II (Commerce Clause) by Roxy Huber.(Wesoky, Jack)
March 28, 2011 94 MANDATE of USCA as to 86 Notice of Appeal filed by Roxy Huber: The stipulation filed by the parties to dismiss the appeal is granted. Each party shall bear their own costs. (USCA Case No. 11-1082) (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order)(bjrsl, )
March 22, 2011 93 REPORTER TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Suzanne Claar; Transcripts ordered 01/13/11 re: 86 Notice of Appeal by Roxy Huber. Transcript due by 5/22/2011. (bjrsl, )
March 21, 2011 92 MINUTE ORDER. The Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint 14 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/2011.(sah, )
March 18, 2011 91 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON COUNTS I AND II AND STAY PROCEEDINGS ON COUNTS II THROUGH VIII. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/2011. (sah, )
March 11, 2011 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 86 Notice of Appeal by Defendant Roxy Huber (Wesoky, Jack)
March 1, 2011 89 USCA Appeal Fees (USCA Case No. 11-1082); received Payment of $455, receipt number 35650 re 86 Notice of Appeal filed by Roxy Huber (bjrsl, )
February 28, 2011 88 USCA Case Number 11-1082 for 86 Notice of Appeal filed by Roxy Huber. Filing fee due in district court.(bjrsl, )
February 28, 2011 87 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the 86 Notice of Appeal filed by Roxy Huber to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Retained counsel; Fee not paid) (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet, # 2 Preliminary Record including Notice of Appeal)(bjrsl, )
February 25, 2011 86 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 79 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Roxy Huber (Wesoky, Jack)
February 16, 2011 85 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schaefer, Matthew)
February 14, 2011 84 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Status Conference was held on 2/14/2011. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
February 1, 2011 83 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER resetting a hearing pursuant to an unopposed request made by counsel for Defendant. ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference will be held on 2/14/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/1/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
January 28, 2011 82 RECEIPT (COX034787) for 5,000.00 by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The re: 79 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (sah, )
January 28, 2011 81 BOND for Preliminary Injunction posted by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew)
January 26, 2011 80 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference on 2/10/2011 at 10:00 a.m., in light of the 79 Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/26/11. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
January 26, 2011 79 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 filed 8/13/2010, is GRANTED. See order for details. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/26/2011.(sah, )
January 26, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER. Defendants Amended Motion To Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller 71 filed 12/20/2010, is DENIED as moot. The Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Additional, Surreply Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Filed by the Defendant as an Untimely and Non-conforming Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses 71 72 filed 12/22/2010, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/26/2011.(sah, )
January 24, 2011 77 REPLY to Response to 71 Amended MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller filed by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh K, Gable Rep and Ex, # 2 Exhibit Exh L, Keller Dep Cites, # 3 Exhibit Exh M, Keller Dep Cites)(Snyder, Melanie)
January 13, 2011 76 Minute Entry for Preliminary Injunction proceedings held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/13/2011. Taking under advisement 15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter: Suzanne Claar)(babia)
January 10, 2011 75 RESPONSE to 71 Amended MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Excerpts Ex A)(Schaefer, Matthew)
January 6, 2011 74 REPLY to Response to 72 Plantiff's Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew) Modified on 1/6/2011 to create linkage (sah, ).
January 5, 2011 73 RESPONSE to 72 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Additional, Surreply Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Filed by the Defendant As an Untimely and Non-Conforming Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses filed by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Wesoky, Jack) Modified on 1/6/2011 to create linkage (sah, ).
December 22, 2010 72 MOTION to Strike 71 Amended MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller (as Untimely, Non-Conforming, and Additional, Surreply Briefing on Planitff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew)
December 20, 2010 71 Amended MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Barry Dep., # 2 Exhibit B, Barry Report, # 3 Exhibit C, Barry Dep. Exhs., # 4 Exhibit D, Adler Report and Decl., # 5 Exhibit E1of5, Adler Dep. Exhs., # 6 Exhibit E2of5, Adler Dep. Exhs., # 7 Exhibit E3of5, Adler Dep. Exhs., # 8 Exhibit E4of5, Adler Dep. Exhs., # 9 Exhibit E5of5, Adler Dep. Exhs., # 10 Exhibit F, Adler Dep., # 11 Exhibit G, Lichtenstein Decl. and Report, # 12 Exhibit H, Keller Dep., # 13 Exhibit I, Keller Report and Decl., # 14 Exhibit J1of3, Keller Dep. Exhs., # 15 Exhibit J2of3, Keller Dep. Exhs., # 16 Exhibit J3of3, Keller Dep. Exhs.)(Snyder, Melanie)
December 17, 2010 70 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Excerpts from the Transcript of the Deposition of Dieter G. Gable by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew)
December 17, 2010 69 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Excerpts from the Transcript of the Deposition of William F. Fox and accompanying deposition exhibits by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 95, # 2 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 96, # 3 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 98, # 4 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 99, # 5 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 100, # 6 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 101)(Schaefer, Matthew)
December 17, 2010 68 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Excerpts From the Transcript of the Deposition of Thomas J. Adler and accompanying deposition exhibits by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 21, # 2 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 39, # 3 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 42, # 4 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 44, # 5 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 47, # 6 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 48, # 7 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 49, # 8 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 52, # 9 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 53, # 10 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 54, # 11 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 55, # 12 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 56, # 13 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 57, # 14 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 58, # 15 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 60, # 16 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 61, # 17 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 62, # 18 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 63, # 19 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 65, # 20 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 66, # 21 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 67, # 22 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 68, # 23 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 69, # 24 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 70, # 25 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 72, # 26 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 74, # 27 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 76, # 28 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 79, # 29 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 80, # 30 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 82, # 31 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 86, # 32 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 87, # 33 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 88, # 34 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 90, # 35 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 92, # 36 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 93)(Schaefer, Matthew)
December 17, 2010 67 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Excerpts from the Transcript of the Deposition of Kevin Lane Keller and accompanying deposition exhibits by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 16, # 2 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 17, # 3 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 18, # 4 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 19, # 5 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 20, # 6 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 21, # 7 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 22, # 8 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 23, # 9 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 24, # 10 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 25, # 11 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 26, # 12 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 29, # 13 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 30, # 14 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 31, # 15 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 32, # 16 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 33, # 17 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 34, # 18 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 35, # 19 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 36, # 20 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 37, # 21 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 38)(Schaefer, Matthew)
December 17, 2010 66 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Excerpts from the Transcript of the Deposition of F. Curtis Barry and accompanying deposition exhibits by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 3, # 3 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 4, # 4 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 5, # 5 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 7, # 6 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 8, # 7 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 9, # 8 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 10, # 9 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 11, # 10 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 12, # 11 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 13, # 12 Exhibit Dep. Ex. 15)(Schaefer, Matthew)
December 17, 2010 65 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY Joint Designation of Additional Deposition Testimony Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew)
December 17, 2010 64 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion For Leave To Exceed Page Limitation For Her Motion To Exclude The Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witness 62 is GRANTED. Defendants Motion To Exclude The Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller 63 is accepted for filing. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/2010.(sah, )
December 16, 2010 63 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses F. Curtis Barry, Thomas Adler, and Kevin Lane Keller by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Barry Dep., # 2 Exhibit B- Barry Report, # 3 Exhibit C- Barry Dep. Exhs., # 4 Exhibit D- Adler Report and Decl., # 5 Exhibit E-1of5- Adler Dep. Exhs, # 6 Exhibit E-2of5- Adler Dep. Exhs, # 7 Exhibit E-3of5- Adler Dep. Exhs, # 8 Exhibit E-4of5- Adler Dep. Exhs, # 9 Exhibit E-5of5- Adler Dep. Exhs, # 10 Exhibit F- Adler Dep., # 11 Exhibit G- Lichtenstein Decl. and Report, # 12 Exhibit H- Keller Dep., # 13 Exhibit I- Keller Report and Decl., # 14 Exhibit J-1of3- Keller Dep. Exhs., # 15 Exhibit J-2of3- Keller Dep. Exhs., # 16 Exhibit J-3of3- Keller Dep. Exhs.)(Snyder, Melanie)
December 16, 2010 62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Snyder, Melanie)
December 16, 2010 61 MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have until 12/17/10 to file their Joint Designation of Additional Deposition Testimony. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/16/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
December 16, 2010 60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Designations of Additional Deposition Testimony by One Day by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Wesoky, Jack)
December 6, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER. The Joint Status Report Regarding Hearing on Motion For Preliminary Injunction 58 filed 12/03/2010, is APPROVED. The stipulations stated in the joint status report concerning the composition of the record relevant to plaintiffs motion 15 are APPROVED. The parties request for oral argument is GRANTED. The court SHALL HEAR oral argument relevant to the issues raised by and inherent to the plaintiffs motion 15 on 01/13/2011, commencing at 10:00 a.m. (MST). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/06/2010. (sah, )
December 3, 2010 58 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Isaacson, George)
November 30, 2010 57 REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Snyder, Melanie)
November 29, 2010 56 REPLY to Response to 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Exh A (Barry Decl.), # 2 Deposition Excerpts Reply Exh B (Barry Deposition), # 3 Deposition Excerpts Reply Exh C (Gable Deposition), # 4 Deposition Excerpts Reply Exh D (Keller Deposition), # 5 Affidavit Reply Exh E (Adler Decl.), # 6 Deposition Excerpts Reply Exh F (Adler Deposition), # 7 Affidavit Reply Exh G (Woock Decl.), # 8 Deposition Excerpts Reply Exh H (Fox Deposition))(Isaacson, George)
November 24, 2010 55 MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant is permitted to file a reply brief in support of her motion to dismiss not to exceed twenty 20 pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/24/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
November 24, 2010 54 MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a reply brief to defendant's response in opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction that shall not exceed fifteen 15 pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/24/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
November 23, 2010 53 RESPONSE to 52 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for her Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew)
November 23, 2010 52 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for her Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Scoville, Stephanie)
November 23, 2010 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply to Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schaefer, Matthew)
November 19, 2010 50 RESPONSE to 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 7, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 7, Part 3, # 10 Exhibit 7, Part 4, # 11 Exhibit 7, Part 5, # 12 Exhibit 7, Part 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, Part 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, # 20 Exhibit 14, # 21 Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit 17)(Scoville, Stephanie)
November 8, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER. This matter is before me on the Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 filed 08/13/2010. The defendants response to this motion is due to be filed on 11/19/2010, and the plaintiffs reply is due to be filed on 11/29/2010. On or before 12/03/2010, the parties SHALL FILE a joint status report specifying the amount of time each party estimates she or it will need to present evidence and argument at any hearing on the plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction; by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/08/2010. (sah, )
October 29, 2010 48 Featured Case AMENDED MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has up to and including November 10, 2010 in which to produce a final expert report for its expert on the issue of compliance costs, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/29/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
October 29, 2010 47 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has up to and including November 15, 2010 in which to produce a final expert report for its expert on the issue of compliance costs, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/29/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec)
October 29, 2010 46 MEMORANDUM regarding 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Final Expert Report filed by Roxy Huber.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/29/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
October 28, 2010 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Final Expert Report by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Scoville, Stephanie)
October 14, 2010 44 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Telephonic Discovery Hearing was held on 10/14/2010. ORDERED: The court will apply the current Rule 26 that is in effect, WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the Plaintiff's right to withhold materials that they believe, consistent with the case law, Rule 501, and Rule 26, can be properly withheld. Consistent with Rule 26(b)(5), the Plaintiff is REQUIRED to provide a privilege log of any materials that are withheld. The court will allow the parties to decide whether or not the privilege is properly asserted. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
October 12, 2010 43 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephonic Discovery Hearing on 10/14/2010 at 2:00 p.m., pursuant to an unopposed request made by counsel for Defendant. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/12/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
October 4, 2010 42 Docket Annotation re: 41 Status Conference, Minute Entry was docketed in the wrong case. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah, )
October 1, 2010 41 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/1/2010; Defendants' Motion 22 to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. Discovery is stayed pending a ruling on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 5 . (Court Reporter FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmc, )
October 1, 2010 40 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/1/2010. (klmcd )
October 1, 2010 39 Minute Entry for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/1/2010; Court enters a schedule for resolution of the Plaintiff's pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 . Counsel for defendants makes an oral motion to withdraw the Unopposed Motion for Order. The oral motion to withdraw 27 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Order is GRANTED and the motion is WITHDRAWN. See attached document for deadlines. (Court Reporter FTR - Monique Wiles) (klmcd )
October 1, 2010 38 Proposed Scheduling Order (Plaintiff's Proposal) by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Schaefer, Matthew)
September 27, 2010 37 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Karen Michelle McGovern is terminated as counsel of record, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/27/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec)
September 27, 2010 36 MEMORANDUM regarding 35 Joint MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Roxy Huber.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/27/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
September 27, 2010 35 Joint MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McGovern, Karen)
September 24, 2010 34 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Scheduling Conference was held on 9/24/2010. ORDERED: A Further Scheduling Conference is set for 10/1/2010 at 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Out of town counsel may appear via phone by calling 303.844.2117 at the scheduled time. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 21, 2010 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Melanie J. Snyder by Melanie J. Snyder on behalf of Roxy Huber (Snyder, Melanie)
September 20, 2010 32 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER sua sponte resetting the 9/23/10 Scheduling Conference to 9/24/2010 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A402, pursuant to a conflict on the court's calendar. All of the deadlines set forth in the Court's 3 Order filed on 7/7/10 remain unchanged, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/20/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(cbssec)
September 17, 2010 31 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time in Which To Reply in Support of Her Motion To Dismiss 28 filed 09/16/2010, is GRANTED on the terms stated in this order. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/17/2010.(sah, )
September 16, 2010 30 NOTICE re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Partial Withdrawl of Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant Roxy Huber (Scoville, Stephanie)
September 16, 2010 29 Proposed Scheduling Order (submitted jointly by the parties) by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schaefer, Matthew)
September 16, 2010 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of her Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Scoville, Stephanie)
September 1, 2010 27 (WITHDRAWN)Unopposed MOTION for Order to ON DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION 1) FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, 2) TO CONSOLIDATE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PROCEEDINGS WITH A TRIAL ON THE MERITS ON PLAINTIFFS COMMERCE CLAUSE CLAIMS, 3) TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON PLAINTIFFS REMAINING CLAIMS, AND 4) IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH DEFENDANT MAY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Scoville, Stephanie) Modified on 10/5/2010 pursuant to the Minute Entry dated 10/01/2010 (sah2, ).
August 30, 2010 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert H. Dodd, Jr terminated, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/30/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec)
August 30, 2010 25 MEMORANDUM regarding 24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant filed by Roxy Huber.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/30/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
August 30, 2010 24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dodd, Robert)
August 27, 2010 23 BRIEF in Opposition to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Isaacson, George)
August 25, 2010 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jack M. Wesoky on behalf of Roxy Huber (Wesoky, Jack)
August 19, 2010 21 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time and For Leave To Exceed Page Limitation in Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint 14 , 20 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff shall have until 08/27/2010 to file its response. The brief shall not exceed 36 pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/19/2010.(sah, )
August 13, 2010 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint , and for enlargement of page limitation for opposition by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) for unopposed motion)(Schaefer, Matthew)
August 13, 2010 19 DECLARATION of Thomas J. Adler, PhD regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Isaacson, George)
August 13, 2010 18 DECLARATION of Kevin Lane Keller regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Isaacson, George)
August 13, 2010 17 DECLARATION of Jeana M. Petillo regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Isaacson, George)
August 13, 2010 16 DECLARATION of Jerry Cerasale regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law 15 by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Isaacson, George)
August 13, 2010 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Isaacson, George)
July 30, 2010 14 MOTION to Dismiss 10 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McGovern, Karen) Modified on 8/2/2010 to create linkage (sah2, ).
July 30, 2010 13 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part 12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/30/10. Plaintiff shall file their motion for preliminary injunction that shall not exceed THIRTY (30) pages. Defendant shall file a response to the motion for preliminary injunction that shall not exceed THIRTY (30)pages.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (rebsec, )
July 30, 2010 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in connection with motion for preliminary injunction by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schaefer, Matthew)
July 26, 2010 11 Docket Annotation re: 10 Amended Complaint. Entry modified on 7/26/2010 to note that the document is the First Amended Complaint. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (sah, )
July 23, 2010 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roxy Huber, filed by Direct Marketing Association, The.(Isaacson, George) Modified on 7/26/2010 to note that the document is the First Amended Complaint (sah, ).
July 21, 2010 9 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant has up to and including 7/30/10 to file a responsive pleading, of no more than forty pages, to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/21/10.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cbssec)
July 20, 2010 8 MEMORANDUM regarding 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint and Leave to Extend Page Limitation filed by Roxy Huber.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/20/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(rebsec, )
July 20, 2010 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint and Leave to Extend Page Limitation by Defendant Roxy Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Scoville, Stephanie)
July 20, 2010 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Direct Marketing Association, The.. (Schaefer, Matthew)
July 20, 2010 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Direct Marketing Association, The. Roxy Huber served on 7/2/2010, answer due 7/23/2010. (Schaefer, Matthew)
July 9, 2010 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert H. Dodd, Jr on behalf of Roxy Huber (Dodd, Robert)
July 7, 2010 3 Featured Case ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/23/2010 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/7/10. (cbssec)
July 1, 2010 2 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, for non-dispositive matters, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/1/10. (rebsec, )
June 30, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Roxy Huber ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 29213) Summons Issued, filed by Direct Marketing Association, The. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Direct Marketing Association, The v. Huber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Marketing Association, The
Represented By: George Steven Isaacson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxy Huber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]