State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Jarden Corporation

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Jarden Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02540
Filed: October 18, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2010 11 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/6/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Two (2) day Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/14/10. (rebsec, )
August 2, 2011 19 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Unopposed Motion to Vacate the 8/10/2011 Settlement Conference 17 is GRANTED. The Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2011 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated. A settlement conference will be reset only upon joint motion of the parties. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/2011.(sah, )
October 4, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice 24 filed 10/3/2011, is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/6/2012, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 1/23/2012, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/4/2011. (sah2, )
October 20, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 12/14/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions for Preparation of Scheduling Order, # 2 Scheduling Order Form, # 3 Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge)(sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Jarden Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Alan Greenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarden Corporation
Represented By: Darin James Lang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]