Ramsey et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mason L. Ramsey and Judith Mae Neville
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc., Vikram Pandit, Decision One Mortgage, LLC, Arch Bay Holdings 2010, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing, Aronowitz & Mecklenburg LLP, MERS-Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Ana Marie Peters, Fannie Mae, Charles Pratt and Christopher Cross
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02653
Filed: October 29, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: A Scheduling Conference was held on 2/16/2011. ORDERED: The First Amended Verified Complaint, doc # 30 is ACCEPTED FOR FILING; Motion to Dismiss, doc #[15 ] is DENIED AS MOOT; Motion to Dismiss, doc # 16 is DENIED AS MOOT; Motion to Dismiss, doc # 20 is DENIED AS MOOT; Joint Motion to Strike,doc # 27 is DENIED; Plaintiffs shall file a Response to Motion to Dismiss, doc # 32 ON OR BEFORE MARCH 18, 2011. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
September 28, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection and Amended Objection to the Recommendation 42 and 43 are OVERRULED. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Jud ge 41 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) 32 is GRANTED consistent with this Order, and the case is DISMISSED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/28/11.(jjh, )
December 21, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and Motion for Relief from Judgment, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/21/2011.(wjc, )
November 2, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/2/2010.(erv, )
November 4, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion to Serve Defendants, doc # 3 , is DENIED by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/4/2010.(cbscd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramsey et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason L. Ramsey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Mae Neville
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vikram Pandit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Bay Holdings 2010, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aronowitz & Mecklenburg LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS-Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Marie Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Pratt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]