Pokoik v. 1111 Tower, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kathie Pokoik
Defendant: 1111 Tower, LLC and Land Title Guarantee Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv02702
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/9/2011: 6 Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; 16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint will be filed by February 16, 2011. (Court Reporter: Tracy Weir) (mskcd)
February 10, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 7/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/10/11. (gmssl, )
February 10, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/10/11. (msksec, )
February 22, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 7/14/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/22/2011. (wjc, )
November 12, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/10/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/12/2010. (wjc, )
June 7, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE. The 42 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 06/07/2011.(wjc, )
November 12, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/12/10. (mskcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pokoik v. 1111 Tower, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathie Pokoik
Represented By: Frances A. Koncilja
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1111 Tower, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Title Guarantee Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]