Snider et al v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Snider and Jeanette Snider
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv02730
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Order and Application for Temporary Injunction, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/23/2010. (mehcd)
November 30, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION ON 5 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiffs' Complaint. This Court recommends that the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/30/2010. (mehcd)
February 16, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED re 47 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty ; This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute; finding as moot 11 Motion for TRO; finding as moo t 11 Motion for Permanent Injunction; finding as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 24 Motion to Set Aside ; finding as moot 28 Motion for Permanent Injunction; finding as moot 28 Motion for TRO by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/16/2011.(erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider et al v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Eric Paul Accomazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.