Paulson et al v. Windsor Garden Association

Plaintiff: Marilyn Paulson and Dale Paulson
Defendant: Windsor Garden Association
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02803
Filed: November 16, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendant Windsor Gardens Association's 15 Motion to Set Aside 14 Clerk's Entry of Default, entered February 10, 2011, is vacated and defendant shall file its answer on or before March 7, 2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/24/2011.(rpmcd )
March 8, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/28/2011 10:30 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on 04/21/11 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/08/11. (jjh, )
April 1, 2011 25 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 24 , signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/1/2011. (rpmcd)
April 1, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER to Comply With D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 in court filings as to any information to be submitted under seal based on the 25 Protective Order, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/1/2011. (rpmcd)
May 17, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion For Reasonable Accommodations. All further proceedings in this matter will be conducted in either the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse or the Byron Rogers United States Courthouse, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/17/2011.(rpmcd)
September 22, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER for Dismissal Granting 38 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. All claims against defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs and defendant shall each bear their own costs and expenses, including attorney's fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/22/11.(gmssl, )
November 23, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. Case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/22/10. (gmssl, )
November 26, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return)(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Paulson et al v. Windsor Garden Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Paulson
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Paulson
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Garden Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]