Powell et al v. Brown et al

Plaintiff: Judith L. Powell, Patty L. Powell and Walter N. Powell
Defendant: Darrell N. Brown and Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02808
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Rio Blanco
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 12 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/14/11.(jjh, )
June 22, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Second Stipulated Motion for Modification to Scheduling Order re: 14 . See Order for details by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/22/11. (jjh, )
September 16, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Third Stipulated 16 Motion to Modify 8 ; Discovery due by 2/16/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2012; by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/16/2011.(rpmcd)
January 9, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Modify 8 . Discovery due by 3/19/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2012. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/9/2012.(rpmcd)
February 14, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/14/12. (jjhsl, )
November 18, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/6/2011 11:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on December 30, 2010 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/18/10. (jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Brown et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith L. Powell
Represented By: Gregory A. Gold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty L. Powell
Represented By: Gregory A. Gold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter N. Powell
Represented By: Gregory A. Gold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell N. Brown
Represented By: C. Michael Montgomery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: C. Michael Montgomery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]