Bahlmann v. Great Western Railway of Colorado, LLC

Plaintiff: Lavern E. Bahlmann, Jr.
Defendant: Great Western Railway of Colorado, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv02880
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 5/7/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 4/6/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/28/2011. (rpmcd )
February 13, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to pay their own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/13/12. (jjhsl, )
December 23, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/17/2011 10:30 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on February 10, 2011 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/23/10. (jjh, )
August 25, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Calendar Call set for 10/28/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and counsel are to prepare a joint statement to be handed up when the case is called, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/25/2011. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahlmann v. Great Western Railway of Colorado, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavern E. Bahlmann, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Rossi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Western Railway of Colorado, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]