Porco v. San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc.

Plaintiff: Randy Porco
Defendant: San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv02903
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Conejos
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion. The amended complaint tendered November 2, 2011, is filed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/9/2011.(rpmcd )
June 4, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall serve his Second Amended Complaint within 10 days from the date of this order, and Defendant shall have 14 days thereafter in which to file an amended answer by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/14/12.(jjhsl, )
June 7, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 7/18/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 7/12/2012, lead counsel present in person, and no parties or representatives of parties permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/7/2012. (rpmcd)
July 18, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 11/13/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A and Trial Preparation Conference for 10/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/18/2012. (rpmcd)
November 20, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own attorneys fees and costs in this action, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/20/2012. (rpmcd)
January 11, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/11/2011 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 3, 2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/11/2011. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porco v. San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Porco
Represented By: John Joseph Rossi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Luis & Rio Grande Railroad, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]