Colorado Criminal Defense Bar et al v. Ritter

Plaintiff: Colorado Criminal Defense Bar and Colorado Criminal Justice Reform Coalition
Defendant: Bill Ritter, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02930
Filed: December 2, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Bill Thiebaut. Defendant Thiebaut, as well as all claims against Defendant Thiebaut, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the above-captioned matter, by Judge John L. Kane on 07/11/2011.(wjc, )
July 21, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER SETTING AGENDA FOR JULY 28, 2011 ORAL ARGUMENT, by Judge John L. Kane on 07/21/2011. (wjc, )
July 28, 2011 58 Featured Case Minute Entry for Oral Argument Hearing held before Judge John L. Kane on 7/28/2011. ORDERED: District Attorney Group Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Doc. 44] and State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 38 ar e GRANTED. The Court dismisses the amended complaint but not the civil action. ORDERED: Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 60 days. Plaintiff to notify the court if additional time is needed to file the amended complaint. (Court Reporter: Tracy Weir) (lag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Colorado Criminal Defense Bar et al v. Ritter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Criminal Defense Bar
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Criminal Justice Reform Coalition
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Ritter, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]