St. Paul Sober Living, LLC et al v. Garfield County, Board of County Commissioners

Plaintiff: St. Paul Sober Living, LLC, Chris Edrington, Donald Edrington, Adam Tipton and Alex Colins
Defendant: Garfield County, Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 1:2011cv00303
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation Districts Motion to Dismiss [#37]: DENIED This motion became moot upon plaintiffs filing their Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation Districts Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amend ed Complaint 61 is DENIED. Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Garfield County, State of Colorado 70 is DENIED. Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation Districts Motion for Summary Judgment 104 is DENIED. Pla intiffs Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant Board of County Commissioners, Garfield County 105 is DENIED. Plaintiffs, St. Paul Sober Living and Chris Edringtons Corrected Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute and Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment 106 is GRANTED. Defendant Board of County Commissioners Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Statements and Attachments Thereto Untimely Filed on June 2, 2002 107 is DENIED. [Defendant Boards] Motion to Strike Expert and Motion for Sanctions 115 is DENIED. Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Michelle E. Cormier as Co-Counsel 117 is GRANTED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/5/2012.(sahsl, )
July 16, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims by Plaintiffs St. Paul Sober Living, LLC, Chris Edrington, and Donald Edrington Against Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation District or which could have been brought by Plaintiffs are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and each party to pay his or its own costs and fees. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/16/12. (mnfsl, )
March 15, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2011 is vacated. Status Conference set for 6/1/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All proceedings other than the pending motion to dismiss are stayed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/15/2011. (mehcd, )
September 17, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on post trial motions: denying 163 Motion for Judgment NOV; granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 174 Motion for Review; granting 179 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; finding as moot 181 Motion for Leave. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/17/2013.(trlee, )
September 17, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on PERMANENT INJUNCTION. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/17/201. (trlee, )
October 8, 2013 205 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of St. Paul Sober Living, LLC, Adam Tipton, Alex Colins, Chris Edrington, Donald Edrington against Garfield County, Board of County Commissioners, by Clerk on 10/8/2013. (trlee, )
June 15, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter the First Amended Complaint located at docket #18-1. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/15/2011. (mehcd)
June 30, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 9 defendant Board of County Commissioners of Garfield County's Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/30/11.(mnf, )
November 10, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 42 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Their Second Amended Complaint Against Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation District, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/10/2011. (mehcd)
December 29, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 the Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Designation of rebuttal experts due by 3/2/2012. Discovery due by 4/15/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/31/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/29/2011. (mehcd)
January 17, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Plaintiffs' (Second) Motion for Leave to File Their Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint[48-1]. In the interest of judicial efficiency and maintainin g a consistent docket, both Defendants shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and all applicable local and federal rules. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/17/2011. (mehcd) Modified on 1/17/2012 to remove text minute(lsw, ).
January 23, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A five-day Jury Trial is set for 8/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/13/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/23/2012. (rbjsec.)
January 31, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiffs Alex Colins and Adam Tipton's Claims Against Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation District. Each party is to pay their own attorney's fees and costs, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/31/12.(lsw, )
April 19, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Plaintiffs['] Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 5/16/2012. The dispositive motion deadline remains set for 6/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/19/2012. (mehcd)
May 2, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2012, granting in part, denying in part, and denying without prejudice in part 72 Plaintiffs St. Paul Sober Livin g and Chris Edrington's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents, Answers or Better Answers to Interrogatories and Production of FRCP 30(B)(6) Witnesses as to Defendant Spring Valley Sanitation District. Discovery AS TO DEFENDANT SPRING VALLEY SANITATION DISTRICT ONLY is extended to 6/1/2012. Discovery for Defendant Garfield County remains set for 5/16/2012. (FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501) (mehcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Sober Living, LLC et al v. Garfield County, Board of County Commissioners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Sober Living, LLC
Represented By: Steven Gary Polin
Represented By: Michelle Elise Cormier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Edrington
Represented By: Steven Gary Polin
Represented By: Michelle Elise Cormier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Edrington
Represented By: Steven Gary Polin
Represented By: Michelle Elise Cormier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Tipton
Represented By: Michelle Elise Cormier
Represented By: Steven Gary Polin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Colins
Represented By: Michelle Elise Cormier
Represented By: Steven Gary Polin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County, Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Cassandra Lee Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]