Myers v. Hummel

Defendant: Dorwin Dwayne Hummel
Plaintiff: Bernard Kenneth Myers
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00400
Filed: February 16, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 103 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 95 Defendant's Amended Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment And in the alternative Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the extent it seeks (1) to strike 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) an award of reasonable fees and costs. Defendant shall have twenty-one days from the date of this order to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/01/2011.(wjc, )
March 22, 2011 10 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Myerss Motion to Request Appearance by Telephone at Scheduling Hearing 6 is GRANTED. Defendant Myers may appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference on April 27, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. by dialing the Court at 303-335-2770. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/22/2011.(sah, )
December 9, 2011 119 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2011, taking under advisement 115 Motion for Order. (FTR: Courtroom C-201) (kmtcd)
December 14, 2011 122 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 115 Motion for Order. Plaintiff's deposition shall proceed on December 16, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. Mountain Standard Time. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's financial affidavit shall be under Restriction Level 3. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/14/2011.(kmtcd)
December 15, 2011 124 Featured Case ORDER denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/15/2011.(wjc, )
January 4, 2012 132 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 131 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/04/2012.(wjc, )
January 31, 2012 140 Featured Case ORDER denying 135 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 137 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 135 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/31/2012.(wjc, )
February 2, 2012 142 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 141 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct, Amend, Modify Plaintiff's Original Complaint and in the Alternative Correct, Amend and Modify Plaintiff's More Definate [sic] Statement, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/02/2012.(wjc, )
March 15, 2012 150 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 146 Motion for More Definite Statement. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/15/2012.(jjpsl, )
March 26, 2012 152 Featured Case ORDER granting 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 143 Motion to Amend Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/26/2012. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (jjpsl, )
April 23, 2012 155 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Defendant's Motion for Extended Time and Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. The 153 Final Judgment shall be amended to provide that Defendant is awarded his costs to be taxed by the Clerk of Court under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. Defendant's Motion is denied to the extent that Defendant seeks an award of attorney's fees. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/23/12.(mnfsl, )
March 29, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion To Dismiss Eldon Lowell Myers, Jr. 15 filed 3/28/2011, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, Eldon Lowell Myers, Jr., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant, Eldon Lowell Myers, Jr., is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/2011.(sah, )
March 31, 2011 23 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. plaintiffs Motion To Dismiss Eldon Lowell Myers, Jr. 22 is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/31/2011.(sah, ) Modified on 3/31/2011 to correct the name of the Judge that issued the order(sah, ).
April 6, 2011 27 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Appear via Telephone For Scheduling Conference 25 is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/6/2011.(sah, )
April 12, 2011 35 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Second Motion for Default 31 is DENIED AS MOOT. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/2011.(sah, )
April 14, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER. Defendant's 19 Motion for More Definite Statement is granted. Plaintiff to file amended complaint on or before 4/29/11. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/11 is vacated and reset to 6/7/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/14/11.(lsw, )
April 25, 2011 46 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Second Notice Re: Personal Safety 44 is GRANTED. The Notice 43 is STICKEN. Defendants request for an award of fees is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/25/2011.(sah, )
February 23, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 4/27/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix F, # 2 Appendix F.1., # 3 Notice of Availability of United States Magistrate Judge)(sah, )
May 25, 2011 64 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Fax Excess Pages 62 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may fax a proposed scheduling order of not more than 20 pages to the Court. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/25/2011.(sah, )
May 26, 2011 65 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 60 is DENIED without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/2011.(sah, )
June 3, 2011 78 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 75 Motion to Amend Answer. The proposed Amended Answer 76 is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Any future motion that does not comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A will be summarily denied, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/3/11.(lsw, )
June 7, 2011 79 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 8/6/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/7/11. (rebsec, )
June 22, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERENCE. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case. The 3 Order of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge, entered by Judge Blackburn, is VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 07/20/2012 and the Trial set for 08/06/2012 are VACATED. All other deadlines and hearings set by the Scheduling Order shall remain in effect, unless reset by further Order of the Court, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/22/2011. (wjc, )
June 29, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER accepting 57 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix; denying 51 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/29/2011.(wjc, )
June 29, 2011 92 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 91 Plaintiff's Motion to Move Defendant to Send Ammended [sic] Answer to Plantiff [sic]. Defendant is instructed to send Plaintiff a copy of Defendant's Amended Answer no later than 07/11/2011, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/29/2011.(wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Myers v. Hummel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorwin Dwayne Hummel
Represented By: Gerald Lynn Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Kenneth Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]