1111 Tower, LLC v. Construction Forms, Inc.

Plaintiff: 1111 Tower, LLC
Defendant: Construction Forms, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00425
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/18/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 6/4/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/11/11. (rebsec, )
March 5, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2012. Supplemental Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/5/12. (bnbcd, )
May 1, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice 28 filed May 1, 2012, is GRANTED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for May 18, 2012, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence June 4, 2012, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/1/12.(mjgsl, )
March 4, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/5/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/4/11. (mnf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1111 Tower, LLC v. Construction Forms, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1111 Tower, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Buchanan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Forms, Inc.
Represented By: James Andrew Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]