Sodetz v. OppenheimerFunds, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Richard A. Sodetz
Defendant: OppenheimerFunds, Inc., OppenheimerFunds Distributor, Inc. and Angelo Manioudakis
Case Number: 1:2011cv00603
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND STAY. This case is consolidated for discovery only with 09-cv-00386-JLK-KMT and 09-cv-001186-JLK-KMT. Case is stayed until such time as the court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss filed in the Fixed Income Actions. Discovery related filings shall be made in 09-cv-00386-JLK-KMT and shall specify if it concerns the Cofoid Action, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/29/11. (gmssl, ) Modified on 3/29/2011 to correct typographical error (gmssl, ).
March 29, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND STAY. This case is consolidated for discovery only with 09-cv-00386-JLK-KMT and 09-cv-001186-JLK-KMT. Case is stayed until such time as the court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss filed in the Fixed Income Actions. Discovery related filings shall be made in 09-cv-00386-JLK-KMT and shall specify if it concerns the Sodetz Action, re: 10 Order, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/29/11. (gmssl, )
February 15, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion for Stay. This matter is stayed through and including 04/13/2012. Dismissal Paper due by 4/13/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/15/2012.(wjc, )
March 21, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. The Court GRANTS 7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Enter Order Staying Sodetz v. OppenheimerFunds, Inc., Case No. 11-cv-00603-JLK. The action is hereby STAYED until such time as this Court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss filed in the Fixed Income Fund Actions, or otherwise disposes of the case, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/21/2011.(wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sodetz v. OppenheimerFunds, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Sodetz
Represented By: David Paul Neuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OppenheimerFunds, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OppenheimerFunds Distributor, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Manioudakis
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]