Morris v. Colorado Housing and Finance Authority et al

Plaintiff: Lloyd E. Morris
Defendant: Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Chris Hirai, Lynn M. Janeway, Rose Chamberlain, Charles Banning and Karen Tully
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00702
Filed: March 21, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2011 49 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Preliminary Scheduling Conference held on 8/3/2011 withdrawing 33 Motion for Sanctions; withdrawing 42 Motion for Sanctions; withdrawing 15 Motion for Sanctions; withdrawing 28 Motion for Sanctions; withdrawing Plaintiff's First Verified Amended Complaint 47 . Discovery stayed. (FTR: Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
October 3, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is granted. The 50 -1 The tendered Verified Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. Defendant CHFA's 36 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot , without prejudice to refiling directed to the Amended Complaint. The 20 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Chris Hirai is denied as moot, without prejudice to refiling directed to the Amended Complaint. Defendant Lynn M. Janeway's 9 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/3/11.(mnfsl, )
February 9, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER. All claims by and between plaintiff and defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This case shall be closed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/9/12. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morris v. Colorado Housing and Finance Authority et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd E. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Housing and Finance Authority
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hirai
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn M. Janeway
Represented By: Lynn Marie Janeway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Chamberlain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Banning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Tully
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]