Bank of America v. Bank One, N.A., et al

Defendant: North Park Homeowner's Association, Michael-Neil Schluterbusch, Bank One, N.A., Internal Revenue Service, Colorado Department of Revenue, Compass Bank and Carol Snyder
Plaintiff: Bank of America
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00930
Filed: April 7, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Action affecting property on which US has lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulation, signed by Adams County, District Court Judge C. Scott Crabtree on 3/23/11. (lyg, )
April 18, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/18/11. (bnbcd, )
June 28, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/20/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Two (2) day Bench Trial set for 4/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/28/11. (rebsec, )
February 28, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The United States of Americas Unopposed Joint Motion and Stipulation For Dismissal 54 filed 2/27/2012, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, The Internal Revenue Service, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. Defendant, The Internal Revenue Service, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/28/2012.(sah, )
March 12, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Joint Motion and Stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendants Colorado Department of Revenue and Michael N. Schluterbusch 58 filed 3/9/2012, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims against defendants, Michael Neil Schluterbush and the Colorado Depart ment of Revenue, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs. Any motion filed on behalf of defendants, Michael Neil Schluterbush or the Colorado Department of Revenue, is DENIED as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/2012. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/2012.(sah, )
April 16, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 42 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 44 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/16/12.(mjgsl, )
April 16, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants Bank One, N.A. and Compass Bank, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/16/12.(mjgsl, )
April 19, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 63 Motion to Dismiss. The Joint Motion and Stipulation of Plaintiff and Carol Snyder, Public Trustee For Adams County Colorado To Dismiss and Vacate Trial Preparation Conference and Trial 63 filed April 19, 2012, is GRANTED. That the Trial Preparation Conference set for Friday, April 20, 2012, is VACATED. The trial to the court set to commence April 30, 2012, is VACATED. All claims asserted by the plaintiff against the Public Trustee are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with each of the affected parties to pay its own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/19/12.(mjgsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bank of America v. Bank One, N.A., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Park Homeowner's Association
Represented By: Eric Robert McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael-Neil Schluterbusch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Revenue
Represented By: Michael Jack Axelrad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Snyder
Represented By: Hal Brooks Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America
Represented By: Edward P. Timmins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]