Williams et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda S. Williams and Thomas K. Williams
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association and America's Servicing Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01059
Filed: April 21, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/25/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/11. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(mnfsl, )
August 12, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Defendants U.S. Bank N.A.'s and America's Servicing Company's Second Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2011 at 10:00 AM is vacated and will be reset, if appropriate, only upon a motion filed by Plaintiffs after the Order to Show Cause is resolved. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/12/11.(mnf, )
October 17, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 19 defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Supporting Memorandum Brief. It is further ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for plaintiffs failure to prosecute and to obey orders of the Court by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/17/2011.(erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Williams
Represented By: Robert T. McAllister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Williams
Represented By: Robert T. McAllister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]