Financial Title Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al

Plaintiff: Financial Title Company
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc.
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
In_re: Financial Title Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv01508
Filed: June 9, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 1 National Unions Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference and Demand for Jury Trial. The Court finds good cause exists to withdraw the reference to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court as to Defendant National Union. Plaintiffs claims as serted against National Union shall be heard in this Court with trial to a jury. It is FURTHER ORDERED that there is good cause to permit the adversary proceeding against Executive Risk to continue in the United States Bankruptcy Court. Therefore Nat ional Unions Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference and Demand for Jury Trial is DENIED IN PART as it pertains to Executive Risk. Plaintiffs claims asserted against Executive Risk shall continue to be heard in the United States Bankruptcy Court. by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/11/2011.(erv, )
July 22, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/22/11. (bnbcd, )
August 10, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendant National Union filed a Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Extend Time to File Answer on May 23, 2011, with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. This Motion does not appear on this Courts docket sheet. In order for this Motion to appear on the docket sheet, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to docket the.pdf version of Defendant National Unions Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/10/2011. (erv, )
March 5, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 14 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss as Moot and Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/5/12.(lyg, )
December 13, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 The Parties Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/13/2012.(ervsl, )
June 9, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Refer 1 MOTION for Withdrawal of the Reference to the District Court, signed by U.S. Bankruptcy Court Judge, Michael E. Romero, on 6/9/11. (lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Title Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Title Company
Represented By: Michael J. Pankow
Represented By: Daniel J. Garfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Timothy Robert Macdonald
Represented By: Paul Wayne Rodney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Risk Indemnity, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Christopher Clinton Noecker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Financial Title Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]