Entek GRB, LLC v. Stull Ranches, LLC

Plaintiff: Entek GRB, LLC
Defendant: Stull Ranches, LLC
Counter_claimant: Stull Ranches, LLC
Counter_defendant: Entek GRB, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01557
Filed: June 15, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 103 Second Joint Motion to Modify Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines [CM/ECF 42]. Discovery due by 5/2/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/10/12.(mnfsl, )
March 6, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 34 Motion to Dismiss, ORDERED that Stull Ranches, LLC's First Amended Counterclaim is herebydismissed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/6/2012.(jjpsl, )
March 16, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 107 Third Joint Motion to Modify Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/11/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2012. Affirmative Expert Designations/Disclosures due 3/26/2012. Rebuttal Expert Designations/Disclosures 4/26/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2012.(jjpsl, )
April 2, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 110 Joint Motion for Limited Changes to Interrogatory & RFP Deadline [CM/ECF 42 9f-g]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/12.(mnfsl, )
July 10, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Defendant's Motion to Strike "Rebuttal" Expert Report of Alan Rabinoff. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/10/12.(mnfsl, )
August 1, 2012 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2012. Order taking under advisement 126 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (pabcd)
August 7, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 126 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/7/12.(pabsec)
August 14, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2012 is vacated. The Court will reset the Final Pretrial Conference, if necessary, after resolutions of the 146 , 149 motions for summary judgment. Defendant Stull Ranches 153 Request to Appear by Telephone for Final Pretrial Conference is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/14/12.(mnfsl, )
September 28, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Entek GRB LLC's Motion to Dismiss Stull Ranches, LLC's Third Amended Counterclaim CM/ECF Docket No. 61. Stull Ranches, LLCs 61 Amended Third Counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/28/12.(mnfsl, )
March 27, 2013 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion to Dismiss Entek's First Amended Complaint. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/27/13.(mnfsl, )
March 29, 2013 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant Stull Ranches, LLC's 146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff Entek GRB, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support is granted in part and denied in part. Def endant's 166 Unopposed Motion to Correct Typographical Error in Doc. 158 is granted. Plaintiff Entek GRB, LLC's 122 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Jan T. Tomanek is denied as moot. Entek GRB, LLC's 168 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is granted. Stull Ranches' 169 Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority is granted. This case is closed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/13.(mnfsl, )
March 29, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 173 Order. By Clerk on 3/29/13. (mnfsl, )
September 19, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2011. (Court Reporter: Janet Coppock) (pabcd)
September 26, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Third Counterclaim. The Clerk of Court shall enter the Amended Third Counterclaim located at Docket No. 55 -1, which amends pages 6-7 of the Amended Counterclaims entered at Docket No. 25 , effective as of the date of this Minute Order. Plaintiff shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Third Counterclaim on or before 10/11/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/26/11.(mnfsl, )
September 29, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 64 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Deadline Set in CM-ECF Docket No. 42. The Court accepts Plaintiff's representation that it is not seeking a stay of discovery. The deadline for the filing of a motion for protective order is reset as seven business days after the date when Plaintiff is served with Defendant's initial written discovery requests. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/29/11.(mnfsl, )
June 21, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/31/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/21/11. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(mnf, )
October 7, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (CM-ECF Docket No. 18). The Clerk of the Court shall accept Plaintiff's 72 -1 Verified First Amended Complaint and accompanying Exhibits [Docket Nos. 73-77] for filing. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Verified First Amended Complaint on or before 10/21/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/7/11.(mnfsl, )
December 9, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/9/11.(mnfsl, )
December 19, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 96 Joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/19/2011.(klmcd, )
December 19, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/19/2011. (klmcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Entek GRB, LLC v. Stull Ranches, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entek GRB, LLC
Represented By: L. Poe Leggette
Represented By: Lucy Deakins Arnold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stull Ranches, LLC
Represented By: Dudley W. Von Holt
Represented By: James M. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Stull Ranches, LLC
Represented By: James M. Cox
Represented By: Dudley W. Von Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Entek GRB, LLC
Represented By: Lucy Deakins Arnold
Represented By: L. Poe Leggette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]