Bedlan v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: John J. Bedlan
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01752
Filed: July 5, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/20/2011 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/19/11. (cbssec)
September 20, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 9/10/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/24/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/20/2011. (sah, )
April 18, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice 23 filed April 18, 2012, is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/18/12. (mjgsl, )
August 18, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 9/29/2011 at 10:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/18/11. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bedlan v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Bedlan
Represented By: Fredric A. Bremseth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Torriano N. Garland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]