Global Aerospace, Inc. v. USA

Plaintiff: Global Aerospace, Inc.
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01874
Filed: July 19, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/31/2011 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/03/11. (jjh, )
October 24, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. The Defendant United States of Americas Motion To Consolidate and Certificate of Compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1 67 filed 9/8/2011, is GRANTED. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Contag v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01832-MSK-MJW, Global Aerospace, Inc. v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01874-WYD-KMT, and Craft, et al. v. United States, Civil Action No. 11-cv-02253-REB-MJW, are CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No.10- cv-03050-REB-BNB for all purposes. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No. 11-cv-01832-MSK-MJW and Civil Action No. 11-cv-01874-WYD-KMT, both are REASSIGNED to United States District Judge Robert E. Blackburn and United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No.11-cv-02253-REB-MJW is REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/24/2011 (sah, )
April 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/10/13. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Global Aerospace, Inc. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer P. Henry
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: John H. Martin
Represented By: Habib Nasrullah
Represented By: David C. Schulte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]