USA v. VanDenBerg

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Andrew VanDenBerg
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02042
Filed: August 5, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Consent Judgment re: 18 . ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment 18 is GRANTED. ORDERED that Defendant Andrew VanDenBerg is liable to Plaintiff United States in the total sum of thirty-five thousand dollars ($35,000.00) , with each party to bear its own costs. ORDERED that Defendant Andrew VanDenBerg is enjoined from further trespass along the Whitehead Trail, unless provided with authorization from the U.S. Department of Interior, Bureau of Land Management to maintain the Whitehead Trail or construct a road along the Whitehead Trail by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/18/12.(jjhsl, )
June 27, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal 20 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Case is approved and matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his or its own attorney fees and costs, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/27/12. (gmssl, )
August 17, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/17/11. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. VanDenBerg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Amanda Adams Rocque
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew VanDenBerg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]