Bingham v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Denny J. Bingham
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02134
Filed: August 16, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/7/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 9/24/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/1/11. (rebsec, )
August 14, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/14/2012. (ervsl, )
September 8, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/8/2011. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bingham v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denny J. Bingham
Represented By: James Lee Cox, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Torriano N. Garland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]