MCI Communications Services, Inc. v. Sure Shot Drilling, Inc.

Defendant: Sure Shot Drilling, Inc.
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02188
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/28/2012 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 22, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/22/2012. (rpmcd)
May 9, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STAY AND TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re 15 : the stay order entered on March 28, 2012 13 , is vacated and this civil action will be set for a scheduling conference at a time to be determined, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/9/2013. (rpmcd)
June 4, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/4/2014. (jsmit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI Communications Services, Inc. v. Sure Shot Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sure Shot Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Hathcoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.