Gluhic v. Safeway, Inc.

Plaintiff: Senad Gluhic
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02408
Filed: September 13, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/10/2012. (kmtcd)
March 28, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/28/13.(dkals, )
September 22, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/22/2011. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gluhic v. Safeway, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senad Gluhic
Represented By: Catherine A. Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]