Mosch et al v. Henry et al

Plaintiff: Alvin Mosch, Patricia C. Mosch, David K. Mosch, Alvin (I) Mosch, Patricia (I) C. Mosch and David (I) K. Mosch
Defendant: John Henry and United States Real Estate Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02438
Filed: September 15, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Clear Creek
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Mr. Henry's 102 motion to dismiss and for default judgment against plaintiffs is stricken. Future violations of the applicable rules may subject Mr. Henry to additional sanctions. On or before 9/19/2012, Mr. Henry shall show cause why his future filings should not be typewritten. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/5/12.(mnfsl, )
September 13, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court's September 5, 2012 104 order to show cause is discharged. The filings entitled 107 Attorney J. Charles Shelton's Letter Filed in Rebuttal and Response to Richard L. Garnett's Scathing Letter to John Henry and 108 Personal Letter of Pleading from Richard L. Garnett, and 109 Sean W. Doyle's Draft of Verified Complaint are stricken. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/13/12. (mnfsl, )
November 6, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 142 Statement filed by United States Real Estate Corporation, John Henry, 141 Statement filed by United States Real Estate Corporation, John Henry. Any relief sought by the papers is DENIED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/6/12. (bnbcd, )
November 7, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/7/12. (bnbcd, )
January 28, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 144 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted and the Order therein is affirmed. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/28/13.(mnfsl, )
February 6, 2013 153 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 152 Order. By Clerk on 2/6/13. (mnfsl, )
April 10, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting in part and rejecting in part 162 Report and Recommendations. 155 Motion to Enter Judgment for Attorneys Fees and Expenses Incurred is granted in part. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/10/13.(dkals, )
May 30, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 167 Motion for Permission for Clerk to Issue Writ of Execution. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/30/13.(mnfsl, )
October 15, 2013 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 170 Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Permission for Clerk to Issue Writ of Execution. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue the Writ of Execution [Doc. # 170-1]. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/15/13.(mnfsl, )
October 23, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 174 Motion for Issuance. The Clerk of Court shall issue the Notice of Levy. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/23/13.(mnfsl, )
November 14, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A hearing pursuant to section 13-55-104(1), C.R.S., is set for 11/25/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland to consider the 179 , 180 , 181 , 182 Claims of Exemption. Mr. Henry must appear at the h earing in person. As required by section 13-55-103, C.R.S., all further proceedings with relation to the sale of the property described in the 177 Notice of Levy are stayed until the Claims of Exemption are determined. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/14/13. (mnfsl, )
December 12, 2013 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 197 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. The laims of Exemption [Docket Nos. 179-82, 185, 190-93, 195-96, 198-206, and 211-12] are denied. The stay imposed pursuant to Colo. Rev. Stat. § 13-55-103[Docket No. 184] is lifted. The United States Marshal for the District of Colorado is directed to undertake all necessary proceedings to sell the property subject toexecution. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/12/13.(mnfsl, )
April 1, 2014 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 220 Relief from Judgment and Motions for Vacating Judgments by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/01/14.(jhawk, )
September 15, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Authorizing Telephonic Appearance by Patricia Mosch, by Clear Creek County District Court Judge, Russell H. Granger, on 8/30/11. (lyg, )
November 14, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Scheduling Conference held on 11/14/2011. denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration. Scheduling Conference reset for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland.Mr. Schlie shall enter his appearance on or before November 18, 2011. (FTR: G.Mattei) (bnbcd, )
November 14, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re: 29 MOTION for Reconsideration re 27 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed United States Real Estate Corporation, John Henry. The motion is denied. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Mr Schlie shall enter his appearance as counself for the defendants, if at all, on or before November 18, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/14/11. (bnbcd, )
December 12, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 5 Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/12/11. (pabcd, )
July 19, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 55 Letter is stricken. All papers shall be served on counsel for the plaintiffs in accordance with Rule 5 and shall be accompanied by a proper Certificate of Service. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/19/12. (mnfsl, )
September 23, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/23/11. (bnbcd, )
August 27, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 59 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted in part and the Order therein is affirmed. The 48 motion to set aside default filed by defendant John Henry is granted and the default entered against Mr. Henry is set as ide. Plaintiffs' 46 motion for default judgment is denied in part and denied without prejudice as premature in part. Plaintiff's December 6, 2011 47 filing has been construed as his answer and should not appear in the docket as a motion to dismiss. Pursuant to the 49 order of referral in this case, the magistrate judge may issue an order to show cause and conduct a hearing pursuant to Colo. Rev. Stat. § 38-35-204. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/27/12.(mnfsl, )
August 31, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 97 Notice filed by John Henry by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/31/12. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mosch et al v. Henry et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Mosch
Represented By: Richard Lewis Garnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia C. Mosch
Represented By: Richard Lewis Garnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K. Mosch
Represented By: Richard Lewis Garnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin (I) Mosch
Represented By: Richard Lewis Garnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia (I) C. Mosch
Represented By: Richard Lewis Garnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David (I) K. Mosch
Represented By: Richard Lewis Garnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Henry
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Starrs
Represented By: Susan Bernhardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Starrs
Represented By: Susan Bernhardt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]