McWilliams v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Grant McWilliams
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02589
Filed: October 3, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Administratively Close This File 17 filed 12/20/2011, is GRANTED. Under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is CLOSED ADMINISTRATIVELY. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/20/2011.(sah, )
December 9, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reopening Case. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Reopen The Administratively Closed Case [# 21 ] filed 12/9/2013, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/9/2013.(klyon, )
January 17, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/7/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 11/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 12/1/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/17/14. (rebsec,)
October 20, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 12/16/2011 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/20/11. (cbssec)
November 12, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The 42 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice is APPROVED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/2014. (alowe)
October 25, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion To Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404 6 and Defendants Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion To Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404 7 are STRICKEN for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/25/2011.(sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McWilliams v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant McWilliams
Represented By: Douglas J. Traeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Mark Christian Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]