Wessler et al v. Colonial National Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: Ellen Wessler and Monty Wessler
Defendant: Colonial National Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registry Systems, Inc. and El Paso County Public Trustee
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02683
Filed: October 14, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2012 104 Featured Case ORDER. 38 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED; 79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED; 94 Report and Recommendations is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. The Court enters this order as its final written judgment dismissing this civil action with prejudice. Defendants as the prevailing parties are awarded their reasonable costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and the procedure indicated in D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/28/12. (alvsl)
October 19, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after all responsive pleadings are filed. Please see attached order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/19/2011. (rbjsec. )
March 27, 2012 50 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/27/2012. Granting 37 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Answer to the Amended Complaint is due by April 10, 2012. Response due by April 20, 2012. Reply due by April 30, 2012. Granting 46 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; Denied as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denied as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denied as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss. Discovery due by 9/7/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2012. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/25/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A-902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2013 9:00 AM in Courtroom A-902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. (Court Reporter: Kara Spitler) (lag)
March 27, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE. This matter has been scheduled for a five-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on 2/4/2013 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for 1/25/2013 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel who will try the case shall attend in person. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/27/2012. (sahsl, )
March 30, 2012 55 Featured Case ORDER Settlement Conference set for 5/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/30/2012. (kmtcd)
April 10, 2012 59 Featured Case ORDER Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/10/2012. (kmtcd)
August 3, 2012 88 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING QUESTIONED DOCUMENT. Unopposed Motion of Defendant Colonial National Mortgage, a Division of Colonial Savings, F.A.'s for Submission of Document to Office of the District Court Clerk for Forensic Inspection and Testing [Doc. No. 85 ] is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/03/2012.(wjcsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wessler et al v. Colonial National Mortgage et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Wessler
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Wessler
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial National Mortgage
Represented By: Phillip A. Vaglica
Represented By: Reagan Coe Walsh Larkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Jonathan M. Thompson
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registry Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Nadia G. Malik
Represented By: Jonathan M. Thompson
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Public Trustee
Represented By: Lori Lynn Seago
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]