Davis et al v. Adelberg

Plaintiff: John Alexander
Defendant: Kenneth Adelberg
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02918
Filed: November 9, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. This civil action is dismissed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/09/12.(jjhsl, )
February 15, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER Denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/15/2012.(rpmcd)
December 9, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER for Dismissal of Floyd G. "Schott" Davis and Lavonne J. Davis Without Prejudice. Each party to pay their own costs and fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/09/11. (jjh, )
December 9, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/26/2012 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 19, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/9/2011. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davis et al v. Adelberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alexander
Represented By: James F. Scherer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Adelberg
Represented By: Thomas M. Haskins, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]