Perez v. Douglas County Sheriff Dept. et al

Defendant: City of Denver Police Dept., Adams County Sherrif Dept., Denver County Sheriff Dept., Grand County Sheriff Dept., Winter Park - Fraser Police Dept., Douglas County Sheriff Dept. and Aurora Police Department
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Perez
Case Number: 1:2011cv02975
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 6 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend and Update Complaint; Denying Without Prejudice 8 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Stay of Execution. The Court additionally reminds Plaintiff that, pursuant to the District Judges Order entered November 21, 2011 4 , service on all defendants must be completed by December 21, 2011, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/19/2011.(ervsl, )
February 21, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the Motion to the extent it seeks dismissal of the claims brought by Lina Gisela-Molina, German Jasso, and Laura Gutier rez. However, because Plaintiffs Gonzalo Perez and Julio Arreguin did not sign the Motion, the Court is not able to dismiss their claims at this time and as such the Motion is DENIED as to them. Accordingly, the action remains pending with respect to the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Gonzalo Perez and Julio Arreguin, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/21/2012.(ervsl, )
March 16, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTED 14 Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mixs Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs 1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for violating Rule 4(m); and The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/16/2012.(ervsl, )
November 17, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/17/11.(mnfsl, )
November 22, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Advisement to Pro-se Plaintiffs. Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Douglas County Sheriff Dept. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver Police Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sherrif Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver County Sheriff Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand County Sheriff Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter Park - Fraser Police Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Sheriff Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]