Miller v. Chacon et al

Defendant: Randy R. Chacon and Sheila K. Chacon
Plaintiff: Melissa Miller
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02987
Filed: November 16, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/30/2012. (rpmcd )
November 16, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Status Report, signed by Pueblo County District Court Judge, Victor I. Reyes, on 10/6/11. (lygsl, )
November 21, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 5, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/21/2011. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miller v. Chacon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy R. Chacon
Represented By: Henry R. Miniter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila K. Chacon
Represented By: Henry R. Miniter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Miller
Represented By: Lawrence D. Saunders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]