Fallas et al v. Lincare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Miranda (I) Fallas and Miranda Fallas
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03068
Filed: November 23, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 4/12/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 4/29/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/23/12. (rebsec, )
June 11, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 26 , filed May 7, 2012, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Case is REMANDED to the District Court, City and County of Denver, Colorado, where it was filed originally as Case Number 11CV7545. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/11/12.(mjgsl, )
November 30, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/30/2011. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fallas et al v. Lincare, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda (I) Fallas
Represented By: Steven Paul Johnston
Represented By: Michael Shaefer Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Fallas
Represented By: Michael Shaefer Drew
Represented By: Steven Paul Johnston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Represented By: Michele On-Ja Choe
Represented By: Michael L. O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]