XP Entertainment, LLC et al v. Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.

In_re: XP Entertainment, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Hill
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03073
Filed: November 23, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 12 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay (Notice of Pending Settlement and Motion to Hold Proceeding In Abeyance). The parties shall file dismissal documents, or a joint status report indicating why dismissal documents have not been filed, with the Court not later than, March 16, 2012 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/14/12.(jjhsl, )
March 22, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that the Stipulation of Dismissal 13 is APPROVED. In accordance therewith, this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/22/12. (jjhsl, )
November 23, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Refer 1 Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference to the District Court, signed by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge, Michael E. Romero, on 11/23/11. (lyg, )
December 29, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting Trustee's Motion to Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance and Vacate Trial, by Judge Michael E. Romero, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge on 12/29/11 (gmssl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: XP Entertainment, LLC et al v. Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: XP Entertainment, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Hill
Represented By: David Jarom Warner
Represented By: David Vincent Wadsworth, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Represented By: Dean Andrew McConnell
Represented By: Nancy Dee Miller
Represented By: Alison Claire Sorkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]