Hassan v. State of Colorado, The et al

Plaintiff: Abdul Karim Hassan
Defendant: State of Colorado, The and Scott Gessler
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03116
Filed: November 30, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: DENYING 17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Participate by Telephone. Plaintiff shall be present in person at the Scheduling Conference 2/21/2012 10:30 AM MST, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/14/2012.(mjwcd)
April 30, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon receipt of the Parties' 38 joint motion to file stipulated facts for the Court's use in deciding the motion to dismiss, which has now been converted into a motion for summary judgment, and being fully advised in the premises , the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. The stipulated facts submitted by the parties are deemed admitted for the purposes of deciding the motion for summary judgment in favor of either party, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/30/2012.(ervsl, )
May 3, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/3/12.(pabcd)
December 15, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/15/2011. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hassan v. State of Colorado, The et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gessler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]