Ferndelli v. Travelex Currency Services, Inc.

Defendant: Travelex Currency Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Krista M. Ferndelli
Case Number: 1:2011cv03235
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Joint Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice 22 is GRANTED. Final Pretrial Conference and the Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/8/2013 are VACATED. Jury trial set to commence 2/25/2013 is VACATED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/26/12. (kfinn, )
December 15, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER.A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 3/1/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/15/2011. (sah, )
March 1, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/1/12. (rebsec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferndelli v. Travelex Currency Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelex Currency Services, Inc.
Represented By: Natalia Solis Ballinger
Represented By: Jeannette MacLeod Brook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista M. Ferndelli
Represented By: Bryan E. Kuhn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]