Kennedy v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: Timothy John Kennedy
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03270
Filed: December 13, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 18 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. That under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Kennedy v. United States of America, Civil Action No. 11-cv-3270-REB-KLM is CONSOLIDATED with Kennedy v. Finley, et al., Civil Action No. 11-cv-00967. That under D.C.COLO.LCivR 42.1, Civil Action No. 11-cv-3270-REB-KLM is REASSIGNED to United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
March 18, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff's FTCA claim alleging malicious prosecution is DISMISSED to the extent that claim is based on Agent Peele's testimony during pretrial proceedings and at trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
June 24, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER Of Dismissal. The Joint Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice [# 25 ], filed in the consolidated case, 11-cv-03270-REB-KMT, on June 23, 2014, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2014.(klyon, )
December 16, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/11/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/16/11. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kennedy v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Amy L. Padden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy John Kennedy
Represented By: Brice A. Tondre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]