Robert W. Thomas and Anne McDonald Thomas Revocable Trust, The v. Inland Pacific Colorado, LLC et al

Defendant: First Western Trust Bank, Westminster Promenade Development Company II, LLC and Inland Pacific Colorado, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert W. Thomas and Anne McDonald Thomas Revocable Trust, The
Case Number: 1:2011cv03333
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the Stipulation 107 is APPROVED, and First Western Trust Bank is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that First Western Trust Banks Motion for Summary Judgment 104 is DENIED AS MOOT by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/22/13.(jjhsl, )
February 26, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED this case is stayed as to all Defendants pursuant to the automatic stay provisions of 11 U.S.C. § 362. During the pendency of the stay, it is ORDERED that this case shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, subject to being reopened for good cause. Order denying without prejudice 56 Partial Motion to Dismiss and denying without prejudice 58 Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/26/13.(mjgsl, )
February 23, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/23/12.(jjhsl, )
June 13, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 59 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/13/2012.(klmcd, )
June 12, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/2012. (klmcd, )
June 14, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot in part and denying on the merits in part 22 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/14/12.(dkals, )
January 4, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/1/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/04/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (jjh, )
August 14, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery with Respect to Fraudulent Transfer Claim 64 is DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents 68 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDERED that the Stip ulated Motion to Extend Discovery and Vacate and Reschedule Pretrial Conference 77 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for October 16, 2012, is VACATED and RESET to January 15, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. ORDERED that the proposed pretrial order shall be submitted on or before January 10, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/14/12.(jjhsl, )
September 25, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that The Thomas Trust's Motion for Summary Judgment Reforming Deed of Trust and Ordering Payment of Promissory Note filed January 11, 2012 12 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Pending Dispositive Motions to United States Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for Report and Recommendation filed April 4, 2012 43 is DENIED, by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/25/12.(sgrim)
November 13, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; This matter is before the Court regarding 90 Declaration of Tyler L. Farmer Regarding Expenses Incurred in Bringing Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded no attorneys' fees in connection with its oral motion to compel, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/2012. (klmcd, )
November 14, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The Withdrawal of Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59 (e) filed November 6, 2012 91 is GRANTED. In accordance therewith, the Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 59(e) 89 is WITHDRAWN by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/14/12.(jjhsl, )
November 29, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw [#97] is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Motion [#95] is WITHDRAWN by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/29/12.(jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert W. Thomas and Anne McDonald Thomas Revocable Trust, The v. Inland Pacific Colorado, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Western Trust Bank
Represented By: Mark Forrest Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster Promenade Development Company II, LLC
Represented By: Thomas R. Blackburn
Represented By: Bruce A. Montoya
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Pacific Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Bruce A. Montoya
Represented By: Thomas R. Blackburn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Thomas and Anne McDonald Thomas Revocable Trust, The
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]