Cassino v. Johnson & Johnson

Plaintiff: Lance Cassino
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2011cv03339
Filed: December 20, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 10 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge enteredby Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/3/12. (wydcd, rrk)
January 20, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay and Order, which is contrued by the Court as a motion to continue the Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/24/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/20/2012. (mehcd)
February 13, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 02/13/12. (jjhsl, )
December 28, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. Clerk to randomly reassign this case to another judge, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/28/11. (gmssl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassino v. Johnson & Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Cassino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]