Adams Bank & Trust v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FirsTier Bank) et al

Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FirsTier Bank), Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and FirsTier Bank, Kimball, Nebraska
Plaintiff: Adams Bank & Trust
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv03404
Filed: December 30, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/22/2012. (kmtcd)
May 8, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Cases 12-cv-00240-CMA-KMT and 11-cv-03404-CMA-KMT are consolidated, for all purposes, with Case No. 11-cv-03231. All future filings in any of these actions shall contain the caption as set forth in this Order and shall be docketed in Case No. 11-cv-03231-CMA-MJW. Case Nos. 12-cv-00240-CMA-KMT and 11-cv-03404-CMA-KMT are reassigned and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/8/12.(cmacd )
March 25, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss FTB-NEs Cross-Claim by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/25/13. This case is dismissed.(dkals, )
January 10, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/10/2012. (kmtcd)
January 17, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/17/12. (mskcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adams Bank & Trust v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FirsTier Bank) et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FirsTier Bank)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirsTier Bank, Kimball, Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adams Bank & Trust
Represented By: Robert Bernard Reynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]